LA HCR159 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Task Force on State Retirement System Sustainability
Title
Establishes the Task Force on State Retirement System Sustainability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Vote on HCR 159 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#719) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-28 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Retirement. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |