LA HCR15 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the Southern University Board of Supervisors submit a proposal to the Board of Regents for establishing an associate of applied science degree program in process technology and that the Board of Regents approve it
Title
Requests that the Southern University Board of Supervisors submit a proposal to the Board of Regents for establishing an associate of applied science degree program in process technology and that the Board of Regents approve it
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House Vote on HCR 15 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#323) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-09 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2018-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |