LA HCR147 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests BESE to study the rate of suspensions and expulsions in La. and to submit a written report of findings and recommendations to the House and Senate education committees prior to the 2011 R.S.
Title
Requests BESE to study the rate of suspensions and expulsions in La. and to submit a written report of findings and recommendations to the House and Senate education committees prior to the 2011 R.S.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 147, ADOPT (#1085) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-08 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-04 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-03 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |