LA HCR143 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes congress to give "qualified mortgage" status to balloon loans held in portfolio by a bank and urges and requests the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau to expand the definition of "rural" for such mortgages
Title
Memorializes congress to give "qualified mortgage" status to balloon loans held in portfolio by a bank and urges and requests the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau to expand the definition of "rural" for such mortgages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 143 CONCUR (#789) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |