LA HCR134 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the St. Charles Catholic High School baseball team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2022 Division III state championship
Title
Commends the St. Charles Catholic High School baseball team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2022 Division III state championship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 134 CONCUR (#1263) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |