LA HCR132 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to study and make recommendations regarding alligator markets, populations, and hunting
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to study and make recommendations regarding alligator markets, populations, and hunting
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Brown [D] | Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R] | Rep. Adrian Fisher [D] |
Rep. Aimee Freeman [D] | Rep. Ed Larvadain [D] | Rep. Neil Riser [R] | Rep. Troy Romero [R] |
Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 132 CONCUR (#965) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 132 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#921) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 132 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#921) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2023. |
2023-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-31 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2023-05-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2023-05-25 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |