LA HCR127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the U.S. Land and Water Conservation Fund
Title
Expresses support for the U.S. Land and Water Conservation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 127 ADOPT (#1077) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |