LA HCR126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Hillary R. "Butch" Browning, Jr., on the occasion of his retirement, for his service in fire protection and law enforcement
Title
Commends Hillary R. "Butch" Browning, Jr., on the occasion of his retirement, for his service in fire protection and law enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 126 CO-AUTHORS (#791) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 126 CONCUR (#790) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 126 CONCUR (#790) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |