LA HCR122 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-03 - Read by title, roll called, yeas 29, nays 64. The resolution was rejected.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-03 - Read by title, roll called, yeas 29, nays 64. The resolution was rejected.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the governor of La. to take action to restore voting rights to those in the state who are under an order of imprisonment for conviction of a felony and to work with all stakeholders to ensure more accessibility to voting for those persons who are incarcerated and eligible to vote
Title
Requests the governor of La. to take action to restore voting rights to those in the state who are under an order of imprisonment for conviction of a felony and to work with all stakeholders to ensure more accessibility to voting for those persons who are incarcerated and eligible to vote
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HCR 122 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1249) (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 29, nays 64. The resolution was rejected. |
2016-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-02 | House | Notice given. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016. |
2016-05-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (5-3). |
2016-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-05-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |