LA HCR122 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DHH to submit a Section 1115 demonstration waiver application in order to utilize certain funding for the Medicaid program (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Directs DHH to submit a Section 1115 demonstration waiver application in order to utilize certain funding for the Medicaid program (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Montoucet [D] | Sen. Norby Chabert [R] | Sen. Eric LaFleur [D] | Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 122 CONCUR (#825) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 122 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#457) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 122 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#457) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2013-05-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |