LA HCR111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 29, 2019, as LA Public Education Day at the state capitol
Title
Designates May 29, 2019, as LA Public Education Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 111 ADOPT (#588) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |