LA HB990 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions of the Inmate Rehabilitation and Workforce Development Act (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Amends provisions of the Inmate Rehabilitation and Workforce Development Act (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 990, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1655) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 990, FINAL PASSAGE (#1493) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 990, FINAL PASSAGE (#925) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 990, FINAL PASSAGE (#1493) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 990, FINAL PASSAGE (#925) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 836. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-10 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-09 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-08 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-24 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-19 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-19 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-12 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 19, 2010. | |
2010-05-12 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010. | |
2010-05-07 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-07 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 7, 2010. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |