LA HB99 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of consent judgment against the state through the Department of Transportation and Development in the suit entitled "Larry and Rose Storey, et ux versus State of Louisiana, through the Department of Transportation and Development, G. Wall and Safeway Insurance Company of Louisiana"
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of consent judgment against the state through the Department of Transportation and Development in the suit entitled "Larry and Rose Storey, et ux versus State of Louisiana, through the Department of Transportation and Development, G. Wall and Safeway Insurance Company of Louisiana"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-03-12 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021. |
2021-03-11 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-03-11 | House | Prefiled. |