LA HB979 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the creation of the Louisiana Transportation Infrastructure Bank (REF SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the creation of the Louisiana Transportation Infrastructure Bank (REF SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 979 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1560) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 979 FINAL PASSAGE (#1616) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 979 FINAL PASSAGE (#853) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 979 FINAL PASSAGE (#1616) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 979 FINAL PASSAGE (#853) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2014-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 830. |
2014-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2014. |
2014-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014. |
2014-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2014-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-12 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2014-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014. |
2014-05-05 | House | Notice given. |
2014-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014. |
2014-04-28 | House | Notice given. |
2014-04-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014. |
2014-04-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2014-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |