LA HB973 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB858
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provide relative to the limitation of liability for recreational landowners
Title
Provide relative to the limitation of liability for recreational landowners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 973 FINAL PASSAGE (#793) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 858 reported by the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure (11-0-1). |
Same As/Similar To
HB858 (Replaces) 2024-04-24 - Becomes HB 973.