LA HB969 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to qualifications for election as a member on a school board
Title
Provides relative to qualifications for election as a member on a school board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 969, FINAL PASSAGE (#457) (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-04-28 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-20 | Reported with amendments (14-3) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. |