LA HB96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to state civil service, including providing that employees hired on or after January 1, 2020, shall be in the unclassified service
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to state civil service, including providing that employees hired on or after January 1, 2020, shall be in the unclassified service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. |
2019-03-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-20 | House | Prefiled. |