LA HB919 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-27 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-27 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Rapides Parish Taxing District
Title
Creates the Rapides Parish Taxing District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB919 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=780661 |