LA HB903 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for compliance with federal law for expanded coverage by the Louisiana Health Plan (OR SEE FISC NOTE FF EX)
Title
Provides for compliance with federal law for expanded coverage by the Louisiana Health Plan (OR SEE FISC NOTE FF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB903 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=688372 |