LA HB892 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB200

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the illegal carrying of certain knives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the illegal carrying of certain knives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 892 FINAL PASSAGE (#939) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House Vote on HB 892 FINAL PASSAGE (#434) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 341.
2018-05-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-09SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-02SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-01SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2018-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-13HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/13/18.
2018-04-09HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 200 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (12-2).

Same As/Similar To

HB200 (Replaces) 2018-04-06 - Becomes HB 892.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback