LA HB200 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Becomes HB 892.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Becomes HB 892.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the prohibition on the manufacture, ownership, possession, custody, or use of certain knives and similar instruments
Title
Repeals the prohibition on the manufacture, ownership, possession, custody, or use of certain knives and similar instruments
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | Becomes HB 892. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported by substitute (12-2). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |