LA HB891 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes access to investigational treatments for terminally ill patients
Title
Authorizes access to investigational treatments for terminally ill patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 891 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#833) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#616) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#168) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#616) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#168) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 346. |
2014-05-20 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-19 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-12 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014. |
2014-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014. |
2014-03-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |