LA HB88 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to industrial withdrawal of groundwater from the Southern Hills Aquifer
Title
Provides relative to industrial withdrawal of groundwater from the Southern Hills Aquifer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-03-12 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021. |
2021-03-09 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-03-09 | House | Prefiled. |