LA HB88 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides term limits for certain statewide elected officials
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides term limits for certain statewide elected officials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-08 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2013. |
2013-03-06 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-06 | House | Prefiled. |