LA HB86 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of the consent judgment against the state through the Dept. of Transportation and Development in the suit entitled "Alexandra Broussard vs. The State of Louisiana, through the Department of Transporation and Development, et al"
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of the consent judgment against the state through the Dept. of Transportation and Development in the suit entitled "Alexandra Broussard vs. The State of Louisiana, through the Department of Transporation and Development, et al"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-02-18 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. |
2022-02-17 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-02-17 | House | Prefiled. |