LA HB847 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the filing of an annual use tax return for the payment of use tax on taxable tangible personal property and services purchased from a remote seller (EG INCREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Requires the filing of an annual use tax return for the payment of use tax on taxable tangible personal property and services purchased from a remote seller (EG INCREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |