LA HB846 | 2015 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB202

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Lafayette Parish Bayou Vermilion District (EN NO IMPACT LF See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Lafayette Parish Bayou Vermilion District (EN NO IMPACT LF See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 846 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#996) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 846 FINAL PASSAGE (#892) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 846 FINAL PASSAGE (#573) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 442.
2015-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-09HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2015-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
2015-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2015-06-06SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-06-04SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-06-04SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2015-05-28HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015.
2015-05-20HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-19HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 202 reported by the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs (12-0).

Same As/Similar To

HB202 (Replaces) 2015-05-19 - Becomes HB 846.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB846&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948512
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948520
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953039
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958249
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960531
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950677
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952914
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954729
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957006
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958117
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948513
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948529
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950041
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953049
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953210
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955890
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955745
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958374
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=962725
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=962930
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952975
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956546

Bill Comments

feedback