LA HB837 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the limit on the value of claims approved by the Board of Tax Appeals that are to be paid from current tax collections (RE SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Title
Raises the limit on the value of claims approved by the Board of Tax Appeals that are to be paid from current tax collections (RE SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 837 FINAL PASSAGE (#617) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |