LA HB826 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-01 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-01 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the fee to be charged by the Department of Revenue for the collection and enforcement of collection of sales and use taxes of other taxing authorities (EG INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Establish the fee to be charged by the Department of Revenue for the collection and enforcement of collection of sales and use taxes of other taxing authorities (EG INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 826 FINAL PASSAGE (#572) (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 4. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title. |