LA HB813 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to prescribing, administering, and dispensing of drugs for off-label use
Title
Provides relative to prescribing, administering, and dispensing of drugs for off-label use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 813 FINAL PASSAGE (#662) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2024. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (8-6). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |