LA HB809 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the La. Bicentennial Commission for the purpose of commemorating the anniversary of Louisiana's attainment of statehood (RE +$53,040 GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the La. Bicentennial Commission for the purpose of commemorating the anniversary of Louisiana's attainment of statehood (RE +$53,040 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 809, FINAL PASSAGE (#427) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-04-28 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-27 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-27 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-04-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010. | |
2010-04-19 | Notice given. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 19, 2010. | |
2010-04-12 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-08 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. |