LA HB803 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to interruption of prescription and venue
Title
Provides relative to interruption of prescription and venue
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 803 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1771) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 803 ADOPT (#1490) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 803 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1552) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 803 FINAL PASSAGE (#1048) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 803 FINAL PASSAGE (#612) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 803 ADOPT (#1490) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 803 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1552) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 803 FINAL PASSAGE (#1048) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 803 FINAL PASSAGE (#612) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2024-06-25 | House | Becomes Act No. 789 without the Governor's signature. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2024. |
2024-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2024-06-03 | House | Notice Senate recommitted to the Conference Committee. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2024-06-03 | House | Notice Senate discharged the Conference Committee. |
2024-06-03 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2024-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-06-03 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee members discharged. |
2024-06-03 | House | The House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee. |
2024-06-03 | House | Discharged from Conference Committee. |
2024-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2024. |
2024-05-31 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Miller, Luneau, and Seabaugh. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2024-05-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Muscarello, McFarland, and Melerine. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported favorably (11-0-1). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |