LA HB8 | 2024 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-18 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-18 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the districts for election of the justices of the Supreme Court (Item #3) (EG1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the districts for election of the justices of the Supreme Court (Item #3) (EG1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - House - House Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#5) (Y: 94 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-01-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 10. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-01-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-01-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-01-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 01/17/2024. |
2024-01-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-01-16 | House | Reported favorably (13-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-01-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |