LA HB8 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-04 - Scheduled for floor debate on 03/05/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces the amount of the individual income tax deduction for excess federal itemized personal deductions (Item #6) (EG +$79,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces the amount of the individual income tax deduction for excess federal itemized personal deductions (Item #6) (EG +$79,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House Vote on HB 8 CALL FROM THE CALENDAR (#40) (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - House - House Vote on HB 8 MOTION TO RECONSIDER (#33) (Y: 23 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - House - House Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 50 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - House - House Vote on HB 8 AMENDMENT # 351 BY LEGER MOTION TO ADOPT (#31) (Y: 47 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/05/18.
2018-03-04HouseNotice given.
2018-03-04HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2018-03-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 50, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
2018-03-02HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-03-02HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-02-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/02/18.
2018-02-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-02-25HouseRules suspended.
2018-02-25HouseReported with amendments (10-7-1).
2018-02-19HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-02-16HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-02-16HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=181ES&b=HB8&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1064351
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067243
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1065602
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1066694
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1066141
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067113
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067286
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068953
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069214
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069259
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072811
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072812
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072967
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073503
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1064353
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1064595
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067273
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067322
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073129
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073645

Bill Comments

feedback