LA HB787 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the intentional falsification of reports or records related to criminal investigations or complaints
Title
Prohibits the intentional falsification of reports or records related to criminal investigations or complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 787 FINAL PASSAGE (#531) (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/18. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |