LA HB787 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of handheld cell phones while driving
Title
Prohibits the use of handheld cell phones while driving
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Notice given. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2012. | |
2012-04-25 | Notice given. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-18 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/25/2012. | |
2012-04-17 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-16 | Reported with amendments (9-7) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. |