LA HB785 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the application of foreign laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the application of foreign laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Vote on HB 785, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1647) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 785, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1647) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 785, FINAL PASSAGE (#1489) (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 785, FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-29 Effective date: August 15, 2010.
2010-06-29 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 714.
2010-06-18 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2010-06-17 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2010-06-17 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2010-06-16 Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2010-06-15 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
2010-06-14 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2010-06-11 Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2010-06-10 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2010-06-09 Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2010-06-08 Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2010-05-10 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2010-05-05 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2010-05-04 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2010-04-29 Scheduled for floor debate on May 4, 2010.
2010-04-27 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2010-04-26 Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular).
2010-03-29 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2010-03-19 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
2010-03-18 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2010-03-18 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback