LA HB767 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensure of production facilities for therapeutic marijuana
Title
Relative to licensure of production facilities for therapeutic marijuana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 767 HEALTH AND WELFARE (#446) (Y: 64 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-25 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |