LA HB766 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Effective date: January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Effective date: January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to consumer credit transactions
Title
Provides relative to consumer credit transactions
Sponsors
Rep. Erich Ponti [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 766 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1113) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 FINAL PASSAGE (#1013) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 4177 BY NEVERS HB 766 BY PONTI (#1012) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 3602 BY BROOME HB 766 BY PONTI (#1011) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 4099 BY MARTINY HB 766 BY PONTI (#1010) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 766 FINAL PASSAGE (#313) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 2985 BY JAMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#312) (Y: 43 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 2996 BY JAMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#311) (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 FINAL PASSAGE (#1013) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 4177 BY NEVERS HB 766 BY PONTI (#1012) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 3602 BY BROOME HB 766 BY PONTI (#1011) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 4099 BY MARTINY HB 766 BY PONTI (#1010) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 766 FINAL PASSAGE (#313) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 2985 BY JAMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#312) (Y: 43 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 766 AMENDMENT # 2996 BY JAMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#311) (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | House | Effective date: January 1, 2015. |
2014-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 636. |
2014-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |