LA HB758 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to payments under public contract (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to payments under public contract (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 758 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#729) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 758 FINAL PASSAGE (#598) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 758 HB 758 BY ZERINGUE (#48) (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-05HouseEffective date: 08/01/20.
2020-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 92.
2020-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-31HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2020-05-29SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended.
2020-05-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-26SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReported with amendments.
2020-05-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (20-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB758&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167815
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169198
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172978
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178537
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180314
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168865
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168737
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169190
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170628
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174886
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175831
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176679
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176582
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177869
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178176
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178461
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167816
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168914
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169240
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171520
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173033
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173390
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175638
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178953
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172799
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177836

Bill Comments

feedback