LA HB75 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the applicability of the Public Records Law to records of the judiciary commission
Title
Provides for the applicability of the Public Records Law to records of the judiciary commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 75 FINAL PASSAGE (#100) (Y: 47 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. |
2019-03-18 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-18 | House | Prefiled. |