LA HB747 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB390
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the waiting period before performing a marriage ceremony (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the waiting period before performing a marriage ceremony (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 747 HB 747 BY EMERSON (#848) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 747 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 747 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 276. |
2018-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 390 reported by the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure (6-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB390 (Replaces) 2018-03-28 - Becomes HB 747.