LA HB734 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to victim notification (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to victim notification (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 734 FINAL PASSAGE (#402) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported with amendments (12-1). |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |