LA HB724 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a grant program for site development and improvement (EN -$8,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Establishes a grant program for site development and improvement (EN -$8,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 724 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1599) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 724 FINAL PASSAGE (#1327) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 724 FINAL PASSAGE (#628) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 724 AMENDMENT # 3711 BY IVEY MOTION TO ADOPT (#617) (Y: 39 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 724 FINAL PASSAGE (#1327) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 724 FINAL PASSAGE (#628) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 724 AMENDMENT # 3711 BY IVEY MOTION TO ADOPT (#617) (Y: 39 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective date: 06/17/2022. |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 556. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2022-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |