LA HB723 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB123
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the award of attorney fees to a person making a public records request when the person prevails or prevails in part in a suit instituted by a public body or official
Title
Provides for the award of attorney fees to a person making a public records request when the person prevails or prevails in part in a suit instituted by a public body or official
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 723 FINAL PASSAGE (#863) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 723 FINAL PASSAGE (#212) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 723 FINAL PASSAGE (#212) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 394. |
2018-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/18. |
2018-03-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 123 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (9-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB123 (Replaces) 2018-03-22 - Becomes HB 723.