LA HB71 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the sale or transfer of property between the secretary of state and the DeSoto Parish Police Jury

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the sale or transfer of property between the secretary of state and the DeSoto Parish Police Jury

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction.
2021-03-12HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021.
2021-03-09HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-03-08HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback