LA HB695 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the sale within the state of La. of oysters for raw consumption at all times of the year
Title
Allows the sale within the state of La. of oysters for raw consumption at all times of the year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 695, FINAL PASSAGE (#1040) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 695, FINAL PASSAGE (#648) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 695, FINAL PASSAGE (#648) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 269. | |
2010-06-09 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-08 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-07 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-07 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-25 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-24 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2010. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported with amendments (10-0-1) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled. |