LA HB685 | 2017 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB549

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for membership of the Louisiana Deferred Compensation Commission (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for membership of the Louisiana Deferred Compensation Commission (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 685 FINAL PASSAGE (#490) (Y: 75 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 685 AMENDMENT # 3252 BY PEARSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#489) (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2017-05-25HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 8. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-25HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
2017-05-24HouseNotice given.
2017-05-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17.
2017-05-16HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-15HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 549 reported by the Committee on Retirement (5-1).

Same As/Similar To

HB549 (Replaces) 2017-05-15 - Becomes HB 685.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB685&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041131
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041152
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045405
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041739
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042490
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044538
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044727
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044223
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045058
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041132
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041531
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044485
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045425
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045495
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045363

Bill Comments

feedback