LA HB549 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Becomes HB 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Becomes HB 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Louisiana Deferred Compensation Plan to provide a voluntary option investment, provides for commission membership, and requires reporting
Title
Requires the Louisiana Deferred Compensation Plan to provide a voluntary option investment, provides for commission membership, and requires reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Becomes HB 685. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported by substitute (5-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |