LA HB682 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local public school boards to provide transportation to certain students in BESE-approved alternative education programs for suspended or expelled students (OR INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires local public school boards to provide transportation to certain students in BESE-approved alternative education programs for suspended or expelled students (OR INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB682 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=686179 |